MS HB609 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Universities and Colleges;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
Pending: Senate Universities and Colleges Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Procurement Of Aircraft, Aircraft Maintenance, Parts, Equipment And Services By State Institutions Of Higher Learning Which Offer Undergraduate And Graduate Degree Programs In Aviation Shall Be Exempt From The Public Purchasing Law Requirements; To Authorize The Department Chair To Establish Purchasing Procedures In Compliance With The Exemption, Which Shall Be Approved By The Ihl Board; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public purchasing law; exempt procurement of certain aircraft by state institutions of higher learning from.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Universities and Colleges;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-27HouseDR - TSDP: UC To AC
2021-01-27HouseDR - TSDP: AC To UC
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Universities and Colleges

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback