MS HB605 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 25-11-126, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Persons Who Have At Least 25 Years Of Creditable Service In The Public Employees' Retirement System, Who Were Employed As Public Schoolteachers At The Time Of Their Retirement And Who Have Been Retired And Receiving A Retirement Allowance For At Least One Year, May Be Employed As Teachers By A Public School District After Their Retirement And Receive A Retirement Allowance From The Retirement System During Their Employment As Teachers In Addition To Receiving A Beginning Teacher's Salary; To Amend Sections 25-11-105, 25-11-123 And 25-11-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
PERS; contribution rates not increased unless authorized by Legislature, and make recommendation on changes to the plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2023-02-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 11 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 11 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 11 | 127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |