MS HB597 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Revenue To Revise The Individual Income Tax Forms Used For Returns To Allow An Individual Taxpayer To Designate Up To Two Bank Accounts For Direct Deposit Of The Taxpayer's Refund And The Allocation Of The Taxpayer's Refund Amount Between The Designated Bank Accounts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Revenue; authorize to revise individual income tax forms to allow taxpayer to designate two bank accounts for direct deposit.
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. Carl Mickens [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Foster [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |