MS HB581 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-11-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalty For Disturbance Of A School Session Or Meeting; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Terroristic Threats Law; create.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseTabled
2019-02-08HouseRead the Third Time
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-16HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback