MS HB572 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-7-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Policy On The Use Of Personal Leave Taken By Educators On The Day Before The First Day Of The School Term, The Day Before The Last Day Of The School Term, The Day Before A Holiday Or The Day After A Holiday, To Authorize The Use Of Personal Leave Without Penalty In The Event Of Death Or Funeral Of An Immediate Family Member; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educator use of personal leave; authorize use of by employees on certain days in the event of death or funeral of an immediate family member.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Approved by Governor
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-08HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-07SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-06SenatePassed
2019-03-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Education
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-15HouseReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback