MS HB572 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Donate Certain Real Property Located In Attala County, Mississippi, To The City Of Sallis; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Grant An Easement To Eastbrooke Ii Condominium Association On Certain State-owned Real Property Located In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Transportation Commission; require to donate certain real property to the City of Sallis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-18 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Public Property | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDP: AP To PP | |
2010-01-26 | DR - TSDP: PP To AP | |
2010-01-12 | Referred To Public Property;Appropriations |