MS HB512 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Department Of Revenue From Being A Wholesale Distributor Of Alcoholic Beverages Within This State; To Create A New Section To Be Codified As 67-1-42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Holder Of A Wholesaler's Permit To Distribute Alcoholic Beverages Throughout This State To Properly Permitted Retailers For Resale Subject To The Provisions Of The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; To Provide For The Issuance Of A Wholesaler's Permit; To Require The Holder Of A Wholesaler's Permit To File Reports With The Department Of Revenue Covering Sales Of Alcoholic Beverages And Keep Certain Records; To Provide For The Annual Renewal Of A Wholesaler's Permit; To Amend Sections 67-1-37, 67-1-43, 67-1-45, 67-1-47, 67-1-49 And 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; To Amend Section 27-71-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Levy A Privilege Tax On Holders Of Wholesaler's Permits; To Amend Section 27-71-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Levy A Tax Upon The Sale Of Alcoholic Beverages By A Wholesaler; To Amend Sections 27-71-9, 27-71-11, 27-71-13, 27-71-15, 27-71-17, 27-71-21, 27-71-25, 27-71-29 And 67-5-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; remove DOR from being wholesale distributor, authorize issuance of wholesaler's permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Johnson,Carter |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Zuber |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 71 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 71 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |