MS HB505 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Mississippi Broadband Accessibility Act; To Provide Legislative Findings; To Provide Definitions For The Act; To Require The Director Of Mississippi Public Utilities Staff To Establish And Administer The Broadband Accessibility Grant Program For The Purpose Of Promoting The Deployment And Adoption Of Broadband Internet Access Services To Unserved Areas; To Provide That The Program Shall Be Administered Pursuant To Policies Developed By The Public Utilities Staff, Subject To The Requirements Of The Act, Which Shall Provide For The Awarding Of Grants To Non-governmental Entities That Are Cooperatives, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, Or Other Private Business Entities That Provide Broadband Services; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Broadband Accessibility Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-03-01SenateDR - TSDPAA: EN To AP
2021-02-18SenateReferred To Energy;Appropriations
2021-02-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-09HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Public Utilities

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback