MS HB493 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 25-15-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any County Or Municipality To Offer Any Medicare Eligible County Employee Or Municipal Employee, As The Case May Be, Certain Benefits If The Employee Secures Medicare Coverage In Lieu Of Participating In Any County Or Municipal Medical Or Health Insurance Program; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties and municipalities; authorize to offer Medicare eligible employee benefits when employees secures Medicare under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2021-03-15HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-03-08SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-03-04SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-04SenateAmended
2021-03-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-17SenateReferred To County Affairs
2021-02-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-28HouseDR - TSDP: MU To CA
2021-01-26HouseDR - TSDP: CA To MU
2021-01-18HouseReferred To County Affairs;Municipalities

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2515103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback