MS HB464 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Before An Offender Is Released On Parole By The Parole Board, The Board Shall Provide Notice Of A Period Of Time That Shall Not Exceed 15 Days, Rather Than An At Least 15 Days Notice, To An Offender's Victim Or The Victim's Family When An Offender Is To Be Released By The Board; To Amend Section 47-5-177, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Corrections To Provide Notice Of A Period Of Time That Shall Not Exceed 15 Days, Rather Than An At Least 15 Days Notice, To Certain Local Law Enforcement When An Offender Is Scheduled For Release; To Amend Sections 47-5-157 And 47-5-173, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Members Of The State Parole Board To Receive Compensation Or Per Diem In Addition To Their Salary; To Amend Section 25-3-38, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Bring Forward Sections 47-7-3, 47-7-3.1 Through 47-7-6, 47-7-13 Through 47-7-19 And 47-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Powers And Duties Of The State Parole Board, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Parole board; revise notification time frame given to offender's victim for offender release and remove certain prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 3 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |