MS HB453 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-11-551, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Statute Requiring An Insurer Paying An Automobile Insurance Claim To Add The Business Repairing The Automobile And The Lienholder As Payees On The Check; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Auto insurance; extend repealer on statue requiring repair business and lienholder as additional payees on check paying claim.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-22 | Senate | DR - TSDP: IN To BF |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Business and Financial Institutions |
2017-01-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-23 | House | Passed |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred To Insurance |