MS HB4120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Eupora, Mississippi, To Convey Back To Plymouth Tube Company Certain Real Property; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Eupora; authorize conveyance of certain real property located in City of Eupora Industrial Park back to a certain entity.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2024-04-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed |
2024-04-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |