MS HB4083 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Kelvin Winding Of Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Kelvin Winding of Hinds County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2024-04-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Passed |
2024-04-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |