MS HB383 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 27-25-503 And 27-25-703, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealers On Those Provisions That Establish A Temporarily Reduced Rate For The Levy And Assessment Of Severance Taxes On The Initial Oil And Natural Gas Produced From Certain Horizontally Drilled Wells And Horizontally Drilled Recompletion Wells; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas severance taxes; extend repealer on lower rate for production from horizontally drilled wells.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13 Approved by Governor
2023-03-08SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-06SenateReturned For Enrolling
2023-03-02SenatePassed
2023-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-02-13SenateReferred To Finance
2023-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-02-07HousePassed
2023-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-25HouseDR - TSDP: WM To EN
2023-01-25HouseDR - TSDP: EN To WM
2023-01-10HouseReferred To Energy;Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2725503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2725703Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback