MS HB379 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-13-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Medicaid Coverage For Individuals Who Are Under 65 Years Of Age, Are Not Pregnant, Are Not Entitled To Or Enrolled For Medicare Benefits And Whose Income Is Not More Than 133% Of The Federal Poverty Level, As Authorized Under The Federal Patient Protection And Affordable Care Act; To Provide For A Statewide Special Election To Be Held On Tuesday, November 5, 2024, For The Purpose Of Determining Whether Medicaid Eligibility Will Be Expanded To Persons Authorized For Coverage Under The Federal Patient Protection And Affordable Care Act; To Provide That If A Majority Of The Qualified Electors Voting On The Question In The Special Election Vote For Expanding Medicaid To Those Persons, Then This Act Shall Take Effect On January 1, 2025; To Provide That If A Majority Of The Qualified Electors Voting On The Question In The Election Vote Against Expanding Medicaid To Those Persons, Then This Act Shall Not Take Effect; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid expansion; provide for statewide referendum on question of.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-05HouseDied In Committee
2024-01-22HouseReferred To Medicaid;Appropriations A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4313115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback