MS HB336 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 39-11-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Authority Of The Mississippi Arts Commission To Use Certain Bond Proceeds Deposited Into The Building Fund For The Arts For Costs Incurred By The Commission In Providing Assistance Related To Certain Projects; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Building Fund for the Arts; extend repealer on Arts Commission's authority to use bond proceeds for certain project costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-03 | Passed | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-26 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-26 | Passed | |
2011-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Ways and Means |