MS HB336 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-21-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Recording Of Domestic Abuse Proceedings In Justice And Municipal Court; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Domestic abuse; clarify recording of proceedings in justice and municipal court.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A | |
2010-02-08 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Judiciary A |