MS HB31 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-28-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reconstitute The Mississippi Charter School Authorizer Board For The Purpose Of Better Staggering The Terms Of Each Appointing Authority's Appointees; To Amend Section 37-28-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Legislature To Annually Appropriate Funds And Allocate Positions To The Charter School Authorizer Board; To Amend Section 37-28-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Charter School Authorizer Board And State Department Of Education To Develop A Formula That Requires Local Ad Valorem Contributions To Charter Schools To Be Reconciled Each Year In The Same Manner As Adequate Education Program Payments; To Direct That The Formula Make The Pro Rata Distribution Of Local Ad Valorem Funds Equitable Between School Districts And Charter Schools; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Charter schools; reconstitute authorizer board and require formula to ensure equitable distribution of local funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 28 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 28 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 28 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |