MS HB274 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Municipalities
Pending: Senate Municipalities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize Law Enforcement Officers Who Are Employed By A County Or Municipality To Wear The Official Uniform And Utilize The Official Firearm, Vehicles And Equipment Issued By The Employing Jurisdiction While In The Performance Of Voluntary Disaster Relief In This State Or Another State During Off-duty Hours; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement officers; allow certain use of uniform, weapon, vehicle and equipment for disaster relief when off-duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Municipalities
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback