MS HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-13-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Members For A Community Hospital To Participate In A Health Insurance Plan At The Same Cost As Required Of Hospital Employees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community hospitals; authorize board of trustees members to participate in health insurance plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | Senate | DR - TSDP: IN To AC |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Amended |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Insurance |