MS HB260 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Joint Municipal Law Enforcement Act"; To Define Certain Terms; To Provide That Two Or More Municipalities May Establish A Joint Police Department, If The Governing Authorities Of Such Municipalities Determine It Is In The Best Interest Of The Municipalities; To Provide That A Joint Police Department Shall Be Governed By A Board; To Provide The Membership Of Such Board; To Prescribe The Establishment Process Of A Joint Department; To Provide The Rights And Duties Of A Joint Police Department; To Provide The Funding Mechanism For A Joint Department; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Joint Municipal Law Enforcement Act"; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Reconsidered |
2019-02-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Rushing, Hopkins) |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-31 | House | DR - TSDPCS: JA To MU |
2019-01-29 | House | DR - TSDPCS: MU To JA |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Municipalities;Judiciary A |