MS HB219 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To County Affairs
Pending: Senate County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit Any Municipality, County Or Any Other Political Subdivision From Adopting An Ordinance, Resolution, Rule Or Regulation That Imposes A Civil Penalty Or Fine On A Business Engaged In The Security Business If Such Business Receives A False Security Alarm Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Sections 19-3-40 And 21-17-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local governments; prohibit from imposing penalties or fines on security companies when false security alarm occurs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To County Affairs
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-15HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19340Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback