MS HB212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-15-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Advanced Practice Registered Nurses Licensure Provisions; To Amend Section 73-15-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Reverter On The Definitions Of Clinical Nurse Specialist Practice, Advanced Nursing Practice, Clinical Nurse Specialist And Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Under The Nursing Practice Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Advanced practice registered nurses; extend repealer on licensing provisions of.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Died In Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Recommitted to Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-10 | Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-04 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |