MS HB208 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-13-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Terminology Related To The Offering Of Instruction Under Provisions Of The "mississippi Computer Science And Cyber Education Equality Act"; To Provide That Such Instruction Must Be Taught By Appropriately Endorsed Teachers For Computer Science Courses Which Award Carnegie Units, And By Licensed Teachers Or Paraprofessionals With Proper Training In Computer Science Instruction Who Are Under The Guidance Or Supervision Of A Licensed Teacher; To Include In The Definition Section Of The Act The Meaning Of The Term Paraprofessional; To Amend Section 37-13-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Computer science curriculum; clarify terminology to specify who may provide instruction in.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateDied In Committee
2023-02-14SenateReferred To Education
2023-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-02-06HousePassed
2023-01-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-04HouseReferred To Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3713205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3713211Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback