MS HB208 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 73-31-1 Through 73-31-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Licensure Of Psychologists; To Amend Reenacted Section 73-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make A Minor, Nonsubstantive Change; To Amend Reenacted Section 73-31-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Postdoctoral Training Requirement For Licensure; To Amend Section 73-31-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Reenacted Sections; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychologists; extend repealer on licensure law and remove postdoctoral training requirements for licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10 Approved by Governor
2021-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-04SenateReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-03SenatePassed
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-15HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73311Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733111Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733113New CodeSee Bill Text
733114Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733115Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733117Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733119Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733121Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733123Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733125Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733127Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733129Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73313Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
733131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73315New CodeSee Bill Text
73317Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
73319Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback