MS HB205 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-4-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provisions Relating To Mental Health Standards And Nurse Practitioners-physician Protocol; To Provide That The Records Of A Mental Health Patient Shall Be Certified At Least Annually By A Physician, Clinical Psychologist Or Psychiatric/mental Health Nurse Practitioner After Seeing The Patient In Person Or By Telemedicine; To Require The Regional Community Mental Health/intellectual Disability Centers To Comply With All Of The Board Of Mental Health's Established Standards Applicable To Those Centers; To Authorize The Board To Withhold Any State Funds That Otherwise Would Be Allocated Or Paid To Any Of Those Centers That Does Not Comply With The Board's Established Standards; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Board of Mental Health; extend repealer on mental health services and protocol for providers of.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Bryan,King,Simmons | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Holland,Scott,Moak | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-01-29 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-01-29 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |