MS HB186 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tunica County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tunica County; authorize contributions to Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateDied In Committee
2018-02-09SenateReferred To Local and Private
2018-01-31HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-01-30HousePassed
2018-01-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-02HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback