MS HB186 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-25-38, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Dentists In The Provision Of Law That Regulates Immunity For Medical Professionals Who Provide Necessary Medical Or Health Services Without Expectation Of Payment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentists; provide immunity for if necessary medical services are provided without expectation of payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateDied In Committee
2015-02-09SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2015-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2015-02-04HousePassed
2015-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2015-01-12HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback