MS HB186 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 59-5-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The State Port Authority At Gulfport To Use The Design-build Method Of Contracting For Certain Purposes, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On This Section From July 1, 2010, To July 1, 2013; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Port Authority; extend repealer on authority to use design-build method of contracting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-01-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-02 Died In Committee
2010-01-22 Referred To Ports and Marine Resources
2010-01-21 Transmitted To Senate
2010-01-20 Passed
2010-01-07 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-01-05 Referred To Ports, Harbors and Airports

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback