MS HB1796 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Establish The Commission To Redesign The Mississippi State Flag; To Prescribe The Membership Of The Commission And To Provide For Its Organization And Meetings; To Provide That The New Design For The Mississippi State Flag Recommended By The Commission Shall Not Include The Design Of The Confederate Battle Flag, But Shall Include The Words "in God We Trust"; To Provide That The Commission Shall Make Its Recommendation For The New Design For The Mississippi State Flag By September 14, 2020; To Provide That The New Design For The Mississippi State Flag Recommended By The Commission Shall Be Placed On The Ballot In A Special Election To Be Held On November 3, 2020; To Provide That If A Majority Of The Qualified Electors Vote For The New Design, Then The Legislature Shall Enact Into Law The New Design As The Official Mississippi State Flag; To Provide That If A Majority Of The Qualified Electors Vote Against The New Design, Then The Commission Shall Reconvene To Recommend Another New Design For The Mississippi State Flag To Be Presented To The Legislature During The 2021 Regular Session; To Require That The Special Election Be Administered By Means Of Ballots Containing A Color Picture Or Drawing Of The New Design For The Mississippi State Flag; To Require The Secretary Of State To Provide Those Ballots To The Election Commissioners Of Each County; To Amend Sections 23-15-351 And 23-15-355, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; To Repeal Section 3-3-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Design For The Official Flag Of The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Flag; revise with a commission and require words "In God We Trust."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-27HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-28SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-28SenateReturned For Enrolling
2020-06-28SenateImmediate Release
2020-06-28SenatePassed
2020-06-28SenateAmendment Tabled
2020-06-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-06-28SenateReferred To Rules
2020-06-28HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-06-28HouseImmediate Release
2020-06-28HousePassed
2020-06-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-06-28HouseReferred To Rules
2020-06-28 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 79

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback