MS HB1795 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Employment Security From The Budget Contingency Fund For The Period Beginning On July 1, 2020, And Ending December 30, 2020; To Provide That The Appropriation Shall Be Distributed To The Delta Workforce Investment Area, The Twin Districts Workforce Investment Area, The Mississippi Partnership Workforce Investment Area And The Southcentral Mississippi Workforce Investment Area For Short-term Training Programs And The Equipment And Supplies Necessary To Support Such Short-term Training Programs And To Increase The Capacity Of Training Programs That Are Already In Place So That Employees And Others Who Have Been Displaced Due To The Covid-19 Public Health Emergency Can Be More Competitive And Trained For The Job Market That Emerges After The Covid-19 Public Health Emergency, For On The Job Training And For Certain Administrative Fees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; Department of Employment Security for purposes related to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EC To AP |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations |
2020-06-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-29 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-29 | House | Amended |
2020-06-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-28 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |