MS HB1792 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From The "equity In Distance Learning Fund" To The State Department Of Education To Facilitate Distance Learning Due To Interruptions In Learning As A Result Of The Impact Of Covid-19 On Public Education; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; "Equity in Distance Learning Fund" for purpose of providing distance learning to public K-12 students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-06-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-28 | House | Passed |
2020-06-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-26 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |