MS HB1789 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Secretary Of State From The Budget Contingency Fund For The Period Beginning On July 1, 2020, And Ending December 30, 2020; To Provide That The Appropriation Shall Be Used To Hire Additional Poll Managers For Each Precinct For Election Day And For Other Election-related Expenses In Accordance With The Federal Cares Act And Its Implementing Guidelines, Rules And Regulations; To Provide That Recipients Will Receive Those Funds From The Secretary Of State Upon Application; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; Secretary of State for purposes related to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Amended |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-06-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Beckett, Turner, Currie) |
2020-06-26 | House | Passed |
2020-06-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-26 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69 |