MS HB1754 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1019, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Jackson, Mississippi, To Levy An Additional Tax In An Amount Not To Exceed One Percent On Hotels And Motels For The Purpose Of Providing Additional Funding To Support The Jackson Convention Center; To Require That The Levy Of The Additional Tax May Be Imposed Only If Approved At An Election By 60% Of Those Voting; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Jackson; authorize increase hotel/motel tax to provide funding for Jackson Convention Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Bell [D] | Rep. Earle Banks [D] | Rep. Ronnie Crudup [D] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Rep. De Stamps [D] | Rep. Zakiya Summers [D] | Rep. Shanda Yates [I] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |