MS HB1738 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, To Make A Contribution To The City Of Charleston, Mississippi, For The Maintenance, Improvement And Repair Or For The Provision Of Utilities As Well As Internet Services For City Property That Is Known As The Charleston Armory Building And Grounds; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tallahatchie County; authorize contribution to City of Charleston for certain maintenance and improvements to city's armory building and grounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |