MS HB1733 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1019, Local And Private Laws Of 1996, As Last Amended By Chapter 960, Local And Private Laws Of 2007, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provisions Of Law That Create The Hancock County Tourism Development Bureau And Prescribe Its Powers And Duties; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hancock County Tourism Development Bureau; extend repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-26 | Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-09 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |