MS HB1731 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The City Of Bay St. Louis, Mississippi, To Waive The Required Annual State Audit For The Municipal Fiscal Years Of 2004-2005 Due To The Effects Of Hurricane Katrina; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Bay St. Louis; authorize two-year waiver for required state audit due to effects of Hurricane Katrina.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-26 | Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-05 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |