MS HB1727 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Marshall County, Mississippi, To Enter Into Certain Contracts For The Construction, Reconstruction And Maintenance Of Public Roads And Bridges Within The Chickasaw Trails Industrial Park That Extend Beyond 30 Days From The Termination And End Of The Term Of Office Of Such Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marshall County; certain road contacts within Chickasaw Trails Industrial Park may extend beyond of term of board of supervisors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |