MS HB1715 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Canton, Mississippi, And The Members Of The Board Of Directors Of The Madison County Economic Development Authority To Enter Into Certain Agreements To Grant To Qualifying New Or Expanding Enterprises Legally Permitted Exemptions From, Or A Fee-in-lieu Of, City Ad Valorem Taxes With Respect To Certain Real Property Located Within Two Miles Of The Municipal Boundary Of The City, Together With Any Improvements And Personal Property Located Thereon, In Connection With The Development By The Madison County Economic Development Authority Of Such Real Property For Economic Development Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Canton; authorize to enter into long-term agreements with Madison county Economic Development Authority concerning industrial park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-03-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |