MS HB1705 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Jackson, Mississippi, To Facilitate The Conversion Of Vacant, Abandoned Or Land Struck Off To The State Property Within The City Into Productive Use By Utilizing The Land Bank Process; To Authorize The Creation Of The City Of Jackson Land Bank Authority; To Provide The Powers And Duties Of The Board Of Directors Of The Land Bank Authority; To Authorize The Authority To Acquire And Dispose Of Property; To Provide An Expedited Procedure To Confirm And Quiet Title To Property Acquired By The Authority; To Authorize The Authority Created Under This Act To Enter Into Intergovernmental Agreements For Certain Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Jackson; authorize to create land banks to address blighted properties more efficiently within the city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |
2019-03-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-21 | House | Amended |
2019-03-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |