MS HB1705 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Jackson, Mississippi, To Facilitate The Conversion Of Vacant, Abandoned Or Land Struck Off To The State Property Within The City Into Productive Use By Utilizing The Land Bank Process; To Authorize The Creation Of The City Of Jackson Land Bank Authority; To Provide The Powers And Duties Of The Board Of Directors Of The Land Bank Authority; To Authorize The Authority To Acquire And Dispose Of Property; To Provide An Expedited Procedure To Confirm And Quiet Title To Property Acquired By The Authority; To Authorize The Authority Created Under This Act To Enter Into Intergovernmental Agreements For Certain Purposes; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Jackson; authorize to create land banks to address blighted properties more efficiently within the city.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateDied In Committee
2019-03-29SenateReferred To Local and Private;Finance
2019-03-25HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-21HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-21HouseAmended
2019-03-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-25HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback