MS HB1701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Waveland, Mississippi, To Offer The Public A Twelve Year Lease Of The Waveland Business Center; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Waveland; authorize to offer leasing of Waveland Business Center that binds successor governing authorities of the city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1701.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1701IN.htm |