MS HB1695 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Purpose Of Repairing, Renovating And Refurbishing The Margaret Martin Performing Arts Center In Natchez, Mississippi, Which Is Designated A Mississippi Landmark By The Mississippi Department Of Archives And History; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize issuance for repair and renovation of Margaret Martin Performing Art Center in Natchez.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-26HousePassed
2019-02-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback