MS HB1690 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide For The Method Of Apportionment Of Income For Income Tax Purposes Of Certain Qualified Freight Forwarders That Are Affiliates Of Airlines; To Amend Section 27-7-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; provide for method of apportioning income for certain freight forwarding businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Parks
2019-03-21HouseConferees Named Smith,Lamar,Powell
2019-03-21HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-19SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-19SenateAmended
2019-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-28HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-02-26HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Hopkins, Smith, Lamar)
2019-02-26HousePassed
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback