MS HB1687 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Hinds County, Mississippi, To Establish An Economic And Community Development Authority To Be Known As The Hinds County Economic Development Authority; To Provide For The Appointment Of Trustees Of The Authority; To Provide The Powers And Duties Of The Authority; To Provide That The Authority May Be Authorized By The Board Of Supervisors To Provide Certain Economic Development, And/or Community Development For Municipalities Located In Hinds County; To Provide That The Authority May Be Authorized By The Board Of Supervisors To Provide Certain Community Development Services In The County; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Hinds County To Issue Bonds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Cost Of Acquiring And Improving Land And Buildings Related To Economic Development; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors To Dissolve The Hinds County Economic Development District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hinds County; may establish Hinds County Economic Development Authority and abolish Hinds County Economic Development district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-04-23 | Amended | |
2010-04-22 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-04-22 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-18 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |