MS HB1675 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds For The Purpose Of Making Capital Improvements For State Agencies; To Bring Forward Section 27-7-22.41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes An Income Tax Credit, Insurance Premium Tax Credit And Ad Valorem Tax Credit For Contributions By Taxpayers That Are Business Enterprises To Eligible Charitable Organizations, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for capital improvements for state agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |