MS HB1674 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize A Job Tax Credit For Enterprises That Own Or Operate An Upholstered Household Furniture Manufacturing Facility For Each Full-time Employee Employed By Such Manufacturer In A New Cut And Sew Job; To Provide The Amount Of Such Credit; To Limit The Amount Of The Credit That May Be Claimed In Any One Year; To Authorize Any Tax Credit Claimed But Not Used In Any Taxable Year To Be Carried Forward For Five Consecutive Years; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; authorize job tax credit for new cut and sew jobs in the upholstered household furniture manufacturing industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-16 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-11 | Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-26 | Referred To Finance | |
2010-02-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-24 | Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-17 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Ways and Means |