MS HB1670 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Critical Physician Shortage Incentive Act Of 2019"; To Provide That The Gross Income Of Newly Licensed Physicians, Physician Assistants And Advanced Practice Registered Nurses Practicing In Critical Physician Shortage Areas Shall Not Include Any Income Derived From Providing Services In Critical Physician Shortage Areas; To Provide That The Exemption From Gross Income Authorized By This Act May Be Utilized By The Qualifying Physician, Physician Assistant Or Advanced Practice Registered Nurse For Ten Consecutive Years If The Physician, Physician Assistant Or Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Practices In Such An Area For That Period Of Time; To Amend Section 27-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Critical Physician Shortage Act of 2019; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] | Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |