MS HB1662 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Ripley, Mississippi, To Expand Its Water Distribution Throughout Tippah County, Mississippi, Excluding All Other Certified Areas Other Than The City Of Ripley, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Ripley; authorize expansion of water system in Tippah County except in certificated areas other than those in the city.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Approved by Governor
2023-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-16SenateReturned For Enrolling
2023-03-15SenatePassed
2023-03-09SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-03-06SenateReferred To Local and Private
2023-03-03HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-03-02HousePassed
2023-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-02-15HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback