MS HB1662 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist In Paying Costs Associated With Site Development And Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Of New Buildings And Facilities For, And The Relocation Of, The Mississippi Armed Forces Museum At Camp Shelby To Property Owned By The Mississippi Military Department And Located Near Camp Shelby In Forrest County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for construction of a new Mississippi Armed Forces Museum.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |